Trustees DAN'S FUND FOR BURNS

Charity number: 1098720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Bentley Trustee 15 November 2022
None on record
Jenny Elaine Dorricott Trustee 22 September 2022
None on record
Lisa Kim MacLaren Trustee 21 May 2020
None on record
EMMA DANKS Trustee 15 November 2012
None on record
GREG WILLIAMS Trustee 27 October 2011
None on record
ROSEMARY DERBY Trustee
None on record
ROGER FRANCIS MASEFIELD Trustee
None on record
Alistair Strong ACMA Trustee
None on record