KINGS NORTON TENNIS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kings Norton Tennis Club is a community based tennis club serving the south west area of Birmingham. It provides a coaching programme to the wider community through schools, holiday clubs and regular coaching activities. The club is run by vulunteers and is the only tennis playing facility within the locality providing essential facilities to introduce both adults and youngsters to tennis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 25 March 2004: Standard registration
- GRANGE HILL TENNIS CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Noel Hugh Street | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Edward Laird | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Lilian McCann | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robin Nicholas Johnson | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Arundel | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr WILL DREVER | Trustee | 31 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE ANNE LANGDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER WILLIAM GOODCHILD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.87k | £25.67k | £41.41k | £26.94k | £23.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.13k | £15.48k | £28.23k | £17.92k | £19.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.00k | £17.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 MARCH 2004.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING TENNIS IN THE KINGS NORTON DISTRICT OF BIRMINGHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
IN THE KINGS NORTON DISTRICT OF BIRMINGHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kings Norton Tennis Club
Grange Hill Road
BIRMINGHAM
B38 8RE
- Phone:
- 01214585660
- Email:
- info@kingsnortontennis.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window