TRANSFORMATIONAL BUSINESS NETWORK INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enable business to create jobs and alleviate poverty through economic, social and spiritual transformation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Indonesia
- Kenya
- Singapore
- Uganda
Governance
- 05 September 2003: Standard registration
- TBNF (Working name)
- TRANSFORMATIONAL BUSINESS NETWORK FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart McGreevy | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Michael Sterling | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Skinner | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £542.49k | £3.03k | £95.74k | £1.02k | £285 | |
|
Total expenditure | £494.82k | £155.80k | £136.12k | £1.96k | £1.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £542.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £374.06k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £120.77k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £68.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £217.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/02/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/08/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/02/2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, IN PARTICULAR AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING IN COUNTRIES WHO ARE POOR BY REASON OF BEING UNABLE TO EARN THEIR LIVING BY ANY MEANS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO:- (A) THE PROVISION OF GENERAL AND TECHNICAL ADVICE ON THE ESTABLISHMENT (INCLUDING THE OPERATION) OF BUSINESSES AND OTHER ENTERPRISES; AND/OR (B) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND RE-TRAINING IN THE SKILLS REQUIRED FOR EMPLOYMENT AND SELF-EMPLOYMENT; AND/OR (C) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE PUBLIC CONSISTENT WITH THE OBJECTS ABOVE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 2.02
High Weald House
Glovers End
BEXHILL-ON-SEA
East Sussex
TN39 5ES
- Phone:
- 0207 280 0500
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window