ST MARIES PARENTS TEACHERS & FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1098038
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

fundraising events in support of St Maries School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £11,920
Total expenditure: £8,682

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Wigan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 June 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Melanie Jayne Smith Smith Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
David Phillips Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £4.36k £4.34k £2.12k £5.28k £11.92k
Total expenditure £1.23k £7.91k £7.05k £1.54k £8.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 August 2024 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 October 2023 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 September 2022 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 July 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 July 2021 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. MARIES RC PRIMARY SCHOOL
AVONDALE STREET
STANDISH
WIGAN
WN6 0LF
Phone:
01257422975
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available