FREE@LAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing support and opportunities for local people to improve their standards of living and reach their full potential. This includes youth work, teenage pregnancy and sexual health, dad's support, debt & benefit advice, outdoor activities, multi-media and career support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 08 December 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arthur Tsang | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ayyab Cockburn | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Elaine Limond | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rashida Sharif | Trustee | 23 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Naomi Spencer | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Moore | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
RUBINA DARR | Trustee | 23 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £379.37k | £386.61k | £530.25k | £461.85k | £434.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £379.26k | £363.40k | £502.28k | £481.90k | £466.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £62.11k | £93.54k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £388.66k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £141.58k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £22 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £390.06k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £112.22k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £2.16k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 30 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 30 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 04 APRIL 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 NOVEMBER 2003 as amended on 23 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
2.1 THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY, IN EACH CASE ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: (A) PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF EACH AREA OR REGION IN WHICH THE COMPANY OPERATES WITHOUT DISTINCTION ON GROUNDS OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, SKILLS AND WELL-BEING (BOTH PHYSICAL AND MENTAL) AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE, WHERE COMMUNITY CENTRE MAY MEAN ONE OF A SERIES OF BUILDINGS, IN EACH OF THE AREAS OR REGIONS IN WHICH THE COMPANY OPERATES AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME, WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OF OTHER PERSON OR BODY IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; (C) ESTABLISH AND OPERATE A BUSINESS ORIENTATED SOCIAL ENTERPRISE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS REFERRED TO IN ARTICLE 2.1(A), WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OF OTHER PERSON OR BODY IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; AND (D) CARRY OUT ANY OTHER ACTIVITY FOR THE PURPOSE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS REFERRED TO IN ARTICLE 2.1(A). 2.2 THE COMPANY SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN. 2.3 NOTHING IN THESE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE COMPANY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY STATUTORY PROVISION REGARDING THE MEANING OF THE WORD "CHARITABLE" OR THE WORDS "CHARITABLE PURPOSES" IN FORCE IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 Nechells Park Road
Nechells
BIRMINGHAM
B7 5PR
- Phone:
- 01213275959
- Email:
- info@freeatlast.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window