GURU RAM DAS PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The GRDP serves the community through delivering a range of services to people & groups who are disadvantaged whatever their faith or background. The charity works with beneficiaries to share how to live happily and healthily in mind, body & spirit. This includes the practice of Kundalini Yoga & meditation, the provision of holistic healthcare, developing an attitude of service towards others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
- Kent
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 July 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Piva | Chair | 09 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jagdeep Kaley | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harsha Moore | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Maria Mayrock | Trustee | 31 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.44k | £16.84k | £7.15k | £10.99k | £14.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.53k | £21.14k | £12.74k | £16.40k | £18.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/02/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/05/2011
Charitable objects
3.1 TO SHARE AND ADVANCE, FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, A PRACTICAL SPIRITUAL LIFESTYLE INCLUDING KUNDALINI YOGA, MEDITATION, HOLISTIC HEALTHCARE AND COUNSELLING TO SUPPORT AND IMPROVE THE MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL BEING OF THE COMMUNITY; 3.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN DHARMIC (GOOD, HEALTHY AND BALANCED)LIFESTYLE BASED ON THE HIGHEST STANDARDS OF PERSONAL CONDUCT AND SERVICE TO OTHERS, SO INDIVIDUALS MAY EMPOWER THEMSELVES AND INSPIRE OTHERS TO PARTICIPATE IN THEIR COMMUNITIES AND LEAD FULFILLING LIVES; 3.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH IMPROVING OPPORTUNITIES FOR LEARNING ABOUT SIKH DHARMA, STRENGTHENING RELATIONS WITH THE SIKH COMMUNITY THROUGH INTER FAITH WORK, SUPPORTING SHARED SPACES FOR EXCHANGE AND SOCIAL INTERACTION AND ENCOURAGING HARMONY ACROSS COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Kings Road
SLOUGH
SL1 2PS
- Phone:
- 07460990932
- Email:
- info@grdp.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window