THE ANTHONY JAMES WESTON MEMORIAL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 15 September 2003: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2004 | 05/04/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £27.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £806 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | 21 February 2006 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | 21 February 2006 | 16 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PUPILS AT GRANGE SCHOLL, KEMPSTON WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window