EARLY RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS STUDY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pub: Rheumatology (Oxford) 2010;49(s1):OP1 Rheumatology (Oxford) 2010;49(s1):184 Rheumatology (Oxford) 2010;49(s1):192 Rheumatology (Oxford) 2010;49(s1):278 Rheumatology (Oxford) 2010;49(s1):349 Ann Rheum Dis 2010;69(s3):522 Ann Rheum Dis 2010;69(s3):717
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
- Essex
- Hampshire
- Hertfordshire
- Lincolnshire
- Medway
- Sheffield City
- Shropshire
Governance
- 31 July 2003: Standard registration
- 18 December 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 18 December 2014: Funds transferred to 1102642 THE EARLY RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS NETWORK
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £7.02k | £0 | £30.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.51k | £104 | £1.70k | £5.39k | £56.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 08 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2014
(These accounts |
08 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 10 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 11 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 27 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 11 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES TREATMENT AND CURE OF EARLY RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS AND RELATED ARTHRITIC DISEASES AND DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH, 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE PEOPLE IN THE MEDICAL PROFESSION IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO RHEUMATIC DISEASE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window