Register of Charities - The Charity Commission THE YOUNG FARMERS' FIELD FUND
Charity Number: 1000981-1
Removed charity
Governing document
CONVEYANCE DATED 7 NOVEMBER 1910 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL TRUST DEEDS DATED 5 OCTOBER 1994 AND 30 MARCH 2000, AND AN ORDER OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 9 APRIL 2003.
Charitable objects
SEE SCHEDULE OF ORDER DATED 9 APRIL 2003.
Area of benefit
SAFFRON WALDEN, ESSEX
Registration history
- 19 May 2003: Standard registration
- 07 September 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.