BEAUCLERC INFANT SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1098157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sponsored Events Fun Run, Guy Fawkes Games,Xmas Bazaar, Xmas Disco, summer Fete and Summer BBQ,prize bingo.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £9,261
Total expenditure: £6,196

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 June 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lucy Griffiths Chair 08 October 2024
None on record
Seema Duggal Trustee 08 October 2024
None on record
Andrew Bravington Trustee 18 October 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £10.91k £4.24k £7.42k £11.17k £9.26k
Total expenditure £14.85k £4.57k £8.61k £14.25k £6.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 10 October 2023 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 September 2022 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 March 2021 265 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
116 FRENCH STREET
SUNBURY
MIDDLESEX
TW16 5LE
Phone:
01932780672
Website:

No information available