PAPPLEWICK PUMPING STATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation and interpretation of Papplewick Pumping Station, Britain's finest Victorian fresh water pumping station and now an accredited museum. The Charity has a strong commitment to heritage and environmental education, in particular water supply and water management.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 20 May 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GLENN CRAIG SAINT | Chair |
|
||||||
Lisa Gee | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Robert Peter Leonard Armstrong | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHRISTOPHER BRITTEN | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr RACHEL LOUISE GOMES | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
SIR EDWARD WILLIAM JOSEPH NALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.49k | £103.40k | £122.12k | £125.09k | £205.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.35k | £79.40k | £99.69k | £121.29k | £178.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.49k | £19.57k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 MARCH 2003.
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION OF THE PAPPLEWICK PUMPING STATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS AN EXAMPLE OF AN HISTORIC PUMPING STATION 2) TO PERMIT THE PAPPLEWICK PUMPIMG STATION TO BE VIEWED BY MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN ORDER TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF THE PUMPIMG STATION 3) WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE EDUCATION ON THE USE AND SUPPLY OF WATER (INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION THE HUMANITARIAN ASPECTS OF WATER USE AND SUPPLY) 4) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE ABOVE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR SOLE DISCRETION DECIDE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Papplewick Pumping Station
Longdale Lane
Ravenshead
NOTTINGHAM
NG15 9AJ
- Phone:
- 01159632938
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window