CHIPPING CAMPDEN MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion and arrangement of concert performances, literary events and music educational activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 14 June 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Victoria Smith | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
ARTHUR CUNYNGHAME | Trustee |
|
||||||||
AILSA SCOTT | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DAVID WYN ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.24k | £257.52k | £269.85k | £351.48k | £330.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.78k | £250.67k | £285.38k | £351.83k | £273.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17 MAY 2005.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS OF MUSIC, PARTICULARLY BY THE ORGANISATION OF A MUSIC FESTIVAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CHIPPING CAMPDEN, GLOUCESTERSIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHIPPING CAMPDEN MUSIC FESTIVAL
HIGH STREET
CHIPPING CAMPDEN
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
GL55 6AG
- Phone:
- 01386841222
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window