DURHAM PHOTOGRAPHIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the education of the public in the art and science of photography, its theory and practice, by the provision of lectures, workshops, information and advice and other related activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
Governance
- 20 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Walton | Chair | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL RITCHIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR ROGER CULPIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR DON BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN ATTLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.93k | £6.81k | £7.31k | £4.12k | £6.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.49k | £5.16k | £6.16k | £3.84k | £5.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF MEMBERSHIP ADOPTED 4 SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF PHOTOGRAPHY, ITS THEORY AND PRACTICE, BY THE PROVISION OF LECTURES, WORKSHOPS, EXHIBITIONS, INFORMATION AND ADVICE AND OTHER RELATED ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Adamson Court
Gainford
Darlington
DL2 3ET
- Phone:
- 01325730055
- Email:
- rogerculpin@talk21.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window