EL SHADDAI DWXI PPFI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 March 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rey Evaristo Matalote Vargas | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Salome Molejon Hartberg | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Analita BAS | Trustee | 10 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
JESSIE BRAO OBLIGADO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.85k | £167.31k | £181.62k | £210.38k | £235.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £195.89k | £140.62k | £186.52k | £229.02k | £149.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 01 April 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 10 April 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 10 April 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 MAY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 29 FEBRUARY 2004 AND 14 FEBRUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CATHOLIC CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE EL SHADDAI DWXI-PRAYER PARTNERS FOUNDATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRINCIPLE LOCALLY IN THE AREA OF GREATER LONDON SERVED BY OUR LADY OF MT CARMEL & ST JOSEPH CATHOLIC CHURCH, BATTERSEA PARK ROAD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
72 Bird in Bush Road
London
SE15 1BB
- Phone:
- 02077067774
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window