MASH (MUTUAL AID AND SELF HELP)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE RECOVERY OF MENTAL HEALTH SERVICE USERS, HOMELESS PEOPLE AND DISADVANTAGED GROUPS IN TORBAY AREA BY THE PROVISION OF RECYCLING CLOTHES, FURNITURE ETC. WE PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THESE GROUPS TO VOLUNTEER TO WORK AND PARTICIPATE IN MEANINGFUL ACTIVITIES. WE ALSO RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF MENTAL HEALTH AND HOMELESSNESS ISSUES TO TACKLE STIGMA AND DISCRIMINATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Torbay
Governance
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2015 | 31/05/2016 | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.54k | £43.52k | £40.81k | £39.86k | £38.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.09k | £50.39k | £46.17k | £52.41k | £46.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 20 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | 20 March 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | 08 March 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | 08 March 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2017 | 12 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2017 | 12 March 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/05/2003 AS AMENDED ON 14/07/2003 AS AMENDED ON 01/09/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF MENTAL HEALTH SERVICE USERS, HOMELESS PEOPLE AND OTHERS DISADVANTAGED BY SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN TORQUAY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS; (A) THE PROVISION OF CLOTHES, FURNITURE AND OTHER GOODS AND SERVICES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE SUCH NEEDS; (B) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN CRAFTS AND SKILLS AND THE PROVISION OF MEANINGFUL OCCUPATION OPPORTUNITIES WITH A VIEW TO ENCOURAGING SOCIAL CONFIDENCE AND INCLUSION; (C) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF MENTAL HEALTH AND HOMELESSNESS ISSUES WITH A VIEW TO ENCOURAGE INTEGRATION OF MENTAL HEALTH USERS AND HOMELESS PEOPLE IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
TORQUAY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window