Accounts and annual returns HARRY EDWARDS HEALING SANCTUARY LIMITED

Charity Number: 1098712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 30 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 30 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 26 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 26 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 17 November 2022 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 17 November 2022 110 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 18 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 18 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 02 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 10 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window