HARRY EDWARDS HEALING SANCTUARY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote public health by the provision and the promotion of spiritual healing for the benefit of the public by educating and training spiritual healers and by ensuring proper standards in the practice of spiritual healing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 July 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Arthur Moore | Chair | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Alexandra Jeffrey | Trustee | 07 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Brewer | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Morris | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kim Pilkington | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Arthur Cheetham | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Stuttle | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £553.25k | £445.93k | £439.27k | £359.04k | £396.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £584.00k | £626.94k | £651.21k | £721.26k | £733.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £338.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £6.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £29.37k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £93.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £84.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £226.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £494.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £89.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £39.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 November 2022 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 17 November 2022 | 110 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 APRIL 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE PUBLIC HEALTH BY THE PROVISION AND THE PROMOTION OF SPIRITUAL HEALING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY EDUCATING AND TRAINING HEALERS AND BY ENSURING PROPER STANDARDS IN THE PRACTICE OF SPIRITUAL HEALING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
BURROWS LEA
HOOK LANE
SHERE
GUILDFORD
GU5 9QQ
- Phone:
- 01483 205627
- Email:
- info@burrowslea.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window