THE ST ALBANS MARTIN TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The care and treatment of persons in need who are homeless or by reason of adverse circumstances are in need of help in acquiring a settled way of life through the establishment of hostels and residential accommodation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 17 July 2003: Standard registration
- 08 April 2009: Removed (Excepted charity)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2004 | 31/05/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.23k | £80.92k | £178.55k | £146.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.06k | £83.23k | £153.26k | £196.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 31 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 31 August 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 23 January 2008 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 15 November 2007 | 15 days late | |
Annual return | 31 May 2005 | 14 February 2008 | 685 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2005 | 05 July 2006 | 96 days late | |
Annual return | 31 May 2004 | 31 October 2005 | 214 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2004 | 12 September 2005 | 165 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 MAY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 APRIL 2008.
Charitable objects
TO SEE TO THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE HOMELESS OR WHO BY REASON OF ADVERSE CIRCUMSTANCES ARE IN NEED OF HELP IN ACQUIRING A SETTLED WAY OF LIFE THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF HOSTELS AND RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE ST ALBANS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window