DICKORY DOCK NURSERY

Charity number: 1100027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVIDES GOOD QUALITY, FLEXIBLE CHILDCARE AND EDUCATION FOR PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £182,123
Total expenditure: £495,150

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 October 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT HUNT Trustee 08 August 2016
None on record
RICHARD GILL Trustee 08 August 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £404.52k £412.36k £402.25k £458.38k £571.10k
Total expenditure £454.60k £380.13k £432.12k £414.66k £495.15k
Income from government contracts £300.17k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.02k £27.77k £8.15k £19.69k £387.27k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.08k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £181.05k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £495.15k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £181.92k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £585

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 11 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 04 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
58 MARGETSON CRESCENT
PARSON CROSS
SHEFFIELD
SOUTH YORKSHIRE
S5 9NB
Phone:
07847221969
Website:

dickorydocknursery.co.uk