THE HERMITAGE FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hermitage Foundation UK are a support group dedicated to working outside Russia for the State Hermitage Museum in St. Petersburg and promoting the Hermitage and Russian culture abroad.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Russia
Governance
- 15 October 2003: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF THE HERMITAGE (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Neil Jones | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Yarker | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
GUY EDWARD MARTYN VESEY | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE De GUITAUT LVO | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marquess of Cholmondeley | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor Brian Francis Allen | Trustee | 18 August 2011 |
|
|||||
ADRIAN DAVID SASSOON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £578.39k | £265.45k | £464.82k | £13.76k | £55.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £437.11k | £186.02k | £144.41k | £98.43k | £121.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £219.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £6.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £288.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £61.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £2.09k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £410.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £5.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £40.51k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £20.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 16 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 MAY 2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 9 DECEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
1 TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT TO THE STATE HERMITAGE MUSEUM OF ST PETERSBURG (THE HERMITAGE) IN RESPECT OF ITS ARTISTIC, SCIENTIFIC, CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AS THE HERMITAGE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME CARRY OUT AS A MUSEUM, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR THE CONSERVATION, REBUILDING OR RENOVATION OF THE HERMITAGE; 2 TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING AND ORGANISING LECTURES, SEMINARS, CONFERENCES, COURSES, EXCHANGES AND EXHIBITIONS IN RESPECT OF THE ARTISTIC, SCIENTIFIC, CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES OF THE HERMITAGE AND BY ORGANISING TOURS OF THE HERMITAGE AND ITS EXHIBITS AND COLLECTIONS; 3 SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE UNITED KINGDOM AND RUSSIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE HERMITAGE FOUNDATION UK
CHARLTON HOUSE
5A BLOOMSBURY SQUARE
LONDON
WC1A 2TA
- Phone:
- 02074047780
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window