Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF WILLIAM CASSIDI SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1098020
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 April 2021 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required