AMERA INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The development and promotion of legal assistance for refugees and forcibly displaced people in the UK and Internationally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Belize
- Benin
- Bermuda
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Bonaire
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Bouvet Island
- Brazil
- British Antarctic Territory
- British Indian Ocean Territory
- British Virgin Islands
- Brunei
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Cayman Islands
- Central African Republic
- Ceuta
- Chad
- Chile
- China
- Christmas Island
- Cocos (KEELING) ISLANDS
- Colombia
- Comoros
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Cook Islands
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cuba
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dhekelia
- Djibouti
- Dominica
- Dominican Republic
- Dubai
- Easter Island
- East Timor
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Estonia
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Falkland Islands
- Faroe Islands
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- French Guiana
- French Polynesia
- French Southern Territories
- Fujairah
- Gabon
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Greenland
- Grenada
- Guadeloupe
- Guam
- Guatemala
- Guernsey
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Heard Island And Mcdonald Islands
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- Howland Island
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Iraq
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Israel
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jarvis Island
- Jersey
- Johnston Atoll
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kingman Reef
- Kiribati
- Kosovo
- Kuwait
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macau
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mali
- Malta
- Marshall Islands
- Martinique
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mayotte
- Melilla
- Mexico
- Micronesia
- Midway Islands
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Mongolia
- Montenegro
- Montserrat
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nauru
- Navassa Island
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Caledonia
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Niue
- Norfolk Island
- Northern Ireland
- Northern Mariana Islands
- North Korea
- Norway
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Palau
- Palmyra Atoll
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
- Poland
- Portugal
- Puerto Rico
- Qatar
- Ras Al-khaimah
- Réunion
- Romania
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Saba
- Saint Barthélemy
- Saint Helena
- Saint-Martin
- Saint Pierre And Miquelon
- Saint Vincent
- Samoa
- San Marino
- São Tomé And Principe
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Sint Eustatius
- Sint Maarten
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Solomon Islands
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Georgia And South Sandwich Islands
- South Korea
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Svalbard And Jan Mayen
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Syria
- Taiwan
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tokelau
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tristan Da Cunha
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Turkmenistan
- Turks And Caicos Islands
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- Umm Al-quwain
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- United States Virgin Islands
- Uruguay
- Uzbekistan
- Vanuatu
- Vatican City
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Wake Island
- Wallis And Futuna
- Western Sahara
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 29 July 2003: Standard registration
- AMERA (Working name)
- AFRICA AND MIDDLE EAST REFUGEE ASSISTANCE (AMERA) (Previous name)
- INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE RIGHTS INITIATIVE (IRRI) (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Wahby | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharmarke Dubow | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Griselda Denizi | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alice Johnson | Trustee | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.46k | £4.93k | £150 | £449 | £48.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.66k | £23.11k | £27.35k | £39.39k | £64.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JANUARY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 JULY 2003. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/04/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/11/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 MAY 2019 as amended on 30 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF REFUGEES BY THE PROVISION OF LEGAL ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE ON MATTERS RELATING TO ASYLUM DETERMINATION, SETTLEMENT OF MIGRANTS, FAMILY REUNIFICATION, AND OTHER MATTERS RELATING TO THE ENJOYMENT OF THE FUNDAMENTAL RIGHTS WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD OWING TO THE POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OF SUCH PERSONS. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR LAWYERS AND PARALEGALS, IN MATTERS RELATING TO FORCED MIGRATION AND THE LAW AFFECTING REFUGEES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
AFRICA AND THE MIDDLE EAST
Contact information
- Address:
-
AMERA International
Suites B and D, Burnham Yard
London End
BEACONSFIELD
Buckinghamshire
HP9 2JH
- Phone:
- 07983 411913
- Email:
- info@amerainternational.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window