ACTION FOR CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We protect and support children and young people, providing practical and emotional care and support, ensuring their voices are heard, and campaigning to bring lasting improvements to their lives. Last year, we helped more than 387,000 children and families across the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£155,280,000
Donations and legacies | £17.20m | |
Charitable activities | £136.25m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.57m | |
Other | £260.00k |
Total expenditure:
£161,032,600
Raising funds | £6.75m | |
Charitable activities | £154.28m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,362,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £91,830,250 from 325 government contract(s) and £713,138 from 52 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £6.75m | |
Charitable expenditure | £154.28m |
People

4432 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
561 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 35 |
£70k to £80k | 24 |
£80k to £90k | 8 |
£90k to £100k | 5 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 3 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 June 2003: Standard registration
- 01 March 2012: Funds received from 1069282-1 BESSELS LEIGH SCHOOL TRUST
- 01 March 2012: Funds received from 1069282 BESSELS LEIGH SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
- 06 December 2018: Funds received from 1072358 LITTLE FLYERS CHILDCARE GROUP
- 27 March 2019: Funds received from 1000016 PLAY MONTGOMERYSHIRE
- 29 May 2019: Funds received from 1170182 WISE OWLS NURSERY AND PRE-SCHOOL
- 02 July 2020: Funds received from 1136305 LITTLE FLYERS (BOSCOMBE DOWN)
- 20 October 2020: Funds received from 1080493 THE BASIL LARSEN 1999 CHARITABLE TRUST
- 14 May 2021: Funds received from 271022 THE GUTHRIE ESSAME CHARITABLE TRUST
- 17 March 2022: Funds received from 1084007 RAINBOWS END PRE-SCHOOL
- 23 September 2022: Funds received from 1091479 ACORN NURSERY (RAF COSFORD)
- 11 October 2022: Funds received from 1062492 PAWPRINTS NURSERY
- 01 June 2023: Funds received from 1080300 THE JANE GIBSON CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
- 01 June 2023: Funds received from 1080300 THE JANE GIBSON CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
- 07 September 2023: Funds received from 294438 THE ELMSETT FELLOWSHIP BRASS BAND
- 28 February 2024: Funds received from 1168152 RHIANNA'S SWING
- 15 March 2024: Funds received from 210618 THE NICHOLAS GALPERIN TRUST (FOR CHARITABLE PURPOS...
- 26 March 2024: Funds received from 215301 NATIONAL CHILDREN'S HOME
- 31 May 2024: Funds received from 1136239 THE HEROES FOUNDATION LIMITED
- 17 July 2024: Funds received from 1128504 FRIENDS OF STEPPING STONES
- NCH (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Welsh Government (Social Landlords And Housing Associations)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarika Patel | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Navin Kaul | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Nairn Geekie KC | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Elizabeth Evans | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Ann Atkin | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Thomas Curran | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Steven David Bell | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael John Adrian Long | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Enda Michael Johnson | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Lesley Warwick | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.65m | £145.21m | £142.65m | £149.79m | £155.28m | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.85m | £139.40m | £139.35m | £149.39m | £161.03m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £86.00m | £84.27m | £86.50m | £84.43m | £91.83m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.33m | £114.00k | £153.00k | £713.14k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £18.71m | £19.98m | £16.24m | £18.57m | £17.20m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £17.75m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £109.14m | £119.11m | £125.41m | £129.86m | £136.25m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £16.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.02m | £827.00k | £919.00k | £1.34m | £1.57m | |
|
Income - Other | £1.05m | £5.30m | £87.00k | £14.00k | £260.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £3.63m | £5.71m | £3.87m | £4.64m | £4.24m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £122.13m | £133.97m | £134.04m | £143.06m | £154.28m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £25.72m | £5.43m | £5.31m | £6.33m | £6.75m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £865.00k | £746.00k | £722.00k | £872.00k | £986.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £35.00k | £46.00k | £52.00k | £52.00k | £88.68k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £18.67m | £18.93m | £18.37m | £22.95m | £27.23m | |
|
Long-term investments | £36.52m | £41.21m | £41.35m | £39.57m | £36.24m | |
|
Other assets | £38.89m | £49.06m | £50.34m | £40.85m | £34.29m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | -£551.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £19.47m | £26.81m | £26.04m | £22.56m | £21.61m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/05/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/01/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/11/2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HAVING AS ITS OBJECTS THE PROMOTION OF THE UPBRINGING AND CARE OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED FROM ALL BACKGROUNDS, CULTURES, AND FAITHS OR NONE IN PARTICULAR BY: 1. PROMOTING THEIR BETTER CARE AND SAFEGUARDING THEM; 2. PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; 3. PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH; 4. PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND ESTABLISHMENT IN LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 THE BOULEVARD
ASCOT ROAD
WATFORD
HERTFORDSHIRE
WD18 8AG
- Phone:
- 01923361500
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window