THE SANELA DIANA JENKINS FOUNDATION FOR BOSNIA (IN MEMORY OF IRNIS CATIC)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Consultancy and advice with the aim of organising, funding, managing and administering the treatment of illness, disease or infirmity, promoting physical and mental health, and supporting the relief of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
Governance
- 13 June 2003: Standard registration
- IRNIS CATIC FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- IRNIS CATIC LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHAHEN DERDERIAN | Trustee | 25 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
SANELA DIANA JENKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73 | £140 | £142 | £66 | £10.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.23k | £7.28k | £29.09k | £58.69k | £50.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1187 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1552 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1552 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 MARCH 2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 03 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO DO ALL THE ACTS AND THINGS WHICH ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW FOR THE TIME BEING AND FROM TIME TO TIME IN ENGLAND AND WALES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO:- (A) ESTABLISH, PROMOTE, EQUIP, ORGANISE, MAINTAIN, FUND, MANAGE AND ADMINISTER AND TO ACT AS PROMOTIONAL AND ADMINISTRATIVE CONSULTANTS, ADVISERS AND AGENTS OF AND IN CONNECTION WITH ANY PLACE OR ACTIVITY IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD BUT PARTICULARLY IN BOSNIA & HERZEGOVINA AND THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE TREATMENT OR RELIEF OF ILLNESS, DISEASE OR INFIRMITY OR THE PROMOTION OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH; (B) ESTABLISH AND CARRY ON IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD BUT PARTICULARLY IN BOSNIA & HERZEGOVINA AND THE UNITED KINGDOM ANY ACTIVITY BY MEANS OF WHICH STUDENTS MAY OBTAIN EDUCATION AND INSTRUCTION IN LANGUAGES, MATHEMATICS, GEOGRAPHY AND HISTORY, AND ALL OTHER SUBJECTS WHATSOEVER THAT MAY BE INCLUDED IN A COMMERCIAL, TECHNICAL, SCIENTIFIC, CLASSICAL OR ACADEMIC EDUCATION, OR MAY BE CONDUCIVE TO KNOWLEDGE OF OR SKILL IN ANY PURSUIT OR CALLING; (C) DO ALL ACTS AND THINGS WHICH PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD BUT PARTICULARLY IN BOSNIA & HERZEGOVINA AND THE UNITED KINGDOM WHETHER BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION OR OTHERWISE
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS, BOSNIA HERZEGOVINA
Contact information
- Address:
-
4211 NOGALES DRIVE
TARZANA
CALIFORNIA
USA
- Phone:
- +13104434152
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window