Accounts and annual returns RONALD MCDONALD HOUSE MOORFIELDS

Charity Number: 1099010
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 22 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 22 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 24 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 17 June 2008 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 18 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 14 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required