SAINT PANCRAS CHURCH CHARITIES

Charity Number: 1100185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

to benefit the poor of the Prish to contribute to the upkeep and repair of the fabric and charitable work of Saint Pancras Parish Church and Church House to contribute to the maintenance and purposes of a Sunday School at Saint Pancras Church to contribute to the maintenance of a Day School in the Parish

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,936
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Camden

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 October 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev LUCY CLARE WINKETT Chair 29 November 2023
THE UNITED CHARITIES IN THE PARISH OF ST JAMES'S WESTMINSTER
Received: On time
ST PANCRAS CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF ARCHBISHOP TENISON
Received: On time
ST JAMES'S PICCADILLY CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES, WESTMINSTER
Received: On time
PROJECT FOR SENIORS AND LIFELONG MINISTRY
Received: On time
SAINT PANCRAS THANET STREET TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PANCRAS, LONDON
Received: On time
Duncan Michael Philip Lamont Trustee 18 March 2018
ST PANCRAS CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
DOROTHEA JOY HACKMAN Trustee 16 March 2012
PROJECT FOR SENIORS AND LIFELONG MINISTRY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PANCRAS, LONDON
Received: On time
SAINT PANCRAS THANET STREET TRUST
Received: On time
CAMDEN CIVIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
EUSTON FOODBANK
Received: On time
ST PANCRAS CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
ELIZABETH ANN DANBURY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.05k £437 £1.32k £11.23k £1.94k
Total expenditure £1.00k £0 £250 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Pancras Parish Church
Euston Road
LONDON
NW1 2BA
Phone:
0203881461
Website:

No information available