THE BURTON LATIMER EX-SERVICEMEN'S ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides financial assistance to needy Burton Latimer Ex-Service people and their dependants of all ages. This assistance includes help towards apprenticeships, re-training and higher educational costs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 23 November 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Charles Wood | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Barnes | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart John Welch | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Peter William Walton | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR B.S.BLOOMFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET HEELS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS R GROOME | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.25k | £13.17k | £16.93k | £17.86k | £18.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.66k | £5.63k | £5.97k | £6.18k | £6.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 November 2024 | 277 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY VIRTUE OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS OR OLD AGE: AND A) ARE CURRENTLY RESIDENT IN BURTON LATIMER OR WHO HAVE PREVIOUSLY LIVED IN BURTON LATIMER FOR A PERIOD OF NOT LESS THAN FIVE YEARS; AND B) ARE FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES OR THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS; OR C) IN SPECIAL CIRCUMSTANCES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE, FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES OR THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO DO NOT FULFIL THE RESIDENCY REQUIREMENTS IN CLAUSE 3(1)(A) ABOVE. 2) THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED BY: A) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR B) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR C) PROVIDING TRAINING OR EDUCATION FOR THEM; OR D) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THOSE IN NEED. 3) IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE OBJECT SPECIFIED IN 3(1) ABOVE, THE TRUSTEES MAY MAKE GRANTS TO OTHER ORGANISATIONS WHOSE PRIMARY OBJECTS ARE THE RELIEF IN NEED OF FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS. 4) TO THESE SEVERAL ENDS, ONLY INCOME NOT THE CAPITAL ASSETS, OF THE ASSOCIATION MAY BE USED.
Area of benefit
BURTON LATIMER, NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 Church Street
BURTON LATIMER
KETTERING
Burton Latimer
Northamptonshire
NN15 5LU
- Phone:
- 07860240085
- Email:
- stuartwelch.ceng@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window