AFGHAN SUPPORT EDUCATION AND TRAINING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RUN EMPLOYMENT SCHEME FOR DESTITUTE WIDOWS IN AFGHANISTAN. DIG WELLS. OPERATE WOMEN'S TRAINING CENTRE. TRAIN TEACHERS. TEACH ENGLISH, COMPUTER & BUSINESS SKILLS. BUILD SCHOOLS. VISIT WOMEN IN PRISON. RUN KINDERGARTENS. BUILD HOSPITALS AND UNDERTAKE WATER PROJECTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Afghanistan
Governance
- 29 September 2003: Standard registration
- 29 September 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ASET (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2012 | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | 31/07/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.90k | £181.86k | £244.93k | £73.75k | £71.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.93k | £194.12k | £216.49k | £125.60k | £76.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 26 July 2017 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2016
(These accounts |
26 July 2017 | 56 days late | |
Annual return | 30 April 2015 | 16 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2015 | 16 December 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2014 | 12 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2014 | 12 February 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 MAY 1903 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 3 SEPTEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE, ADVANCE OR SUPPORT ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES, WHETHER IN AFGHANISTAN OR ELSEWHERE, THAT IS TO SAY THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF AND PREVENTION OF SICKNESS, DISEASE AND PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITY AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY IMPROVING STANDARDS OF HEALTHCARE AND HYGIENE AND KNOWLEDGE OF BASIC MATERNITY CARE FOR WOMEN AND CHILDREN IN AFGHANISTAN OR ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR TO MAKE GRANTS FOR THE PROVISION OF - (A) MEDICAL CARE AND ATTENTION; (B) EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES; AND (C) RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR ANY FORM OF SUFFERING OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE OR CATASTROPHE. (2) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
IN AFGHANISTAN AND ELSEWHERE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window