LINCOLNSHIRE VINTAGE VEHICLE SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PRESERVE RESTORE AND OPERATE HISTORIC ROAD TRANSPORT VEHICLES AS A PERMANENT PUBLIC EXHIBITION AND MUSEUM FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF TECHNICAL, HISTORICAL AND GENERAL EDUCATION AND FOR THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION, DISPLAY AND DEMONSTRATION OF HISTORIC ROAD TRANSPORT VEHICLES , EQUIPMENT, MACHINERY AND RELICS OF HISTORICAL OPERATIONAL AND GENERAL INTEREST AND EDUCATIONAL VALUE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £10,400 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 18 July 2003: Standard registration
- 02 July 2019: Funds received from 702610 THE LINCOLN SPIRITUAL ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN PHILIP MILNER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gary James Nolan | Trustee | 27 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Justin Hart | Trustee | 27 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Leslie Baker | Trustee | 27 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Kathleen Howe secretary | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BRATLEY | Trustee | 07 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER CAIRNS | Trustee | 20 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DAVID GALLAGHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAMELA ANNE FRANCIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.75k | £30.47k | £68.87k | £39.93k | £82.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.56k | £25.42k | £26.49k | £30.65k | £66.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.00k | £44.75k | £6.00k | £10.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 DECEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE, RESTORE AND OPERATE HISTORIC ROAD TRANSPORT VEHICLES AS A PERMANENT PUBLIC EXHIBITION AND MUSEUM FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF TECHNICAL, HISTORICAL AND GENERAL EDUCATION AND FOR THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION, DISPLAY, AND DEMONSTRATION OF HISTORICAL ROAD TRANSPORT VEHICLES, EQUIPMENT, MACHINERY AND RELICS OF HISTORICAL OPERATION AND GENERAL INTEREST AND EDUCATION VALUE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NORTH HYKEHAM AND LINCOLN LN6 3QT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lincolnshire Road Transport Museum
Whisby Road
LINCOLN
LN6 3QT
- Phone:
- 01522 500566
- Email:
- info@lvvs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window