Financial history SARC SOUTH AFRICAN RESOURCES & COUNSELLING

Charity number: 1099778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/03/2020 01/03/2021 01/03/2022 01/03/2023 01/03/2024
Total gross income £2.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £250 £500 £500 £300 £200
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A