Trustees WORTHING WOMEN'S AID
Charity number: 1098726

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Carp | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Manisha Patel | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Abbey | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Haines | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Binks-Moore | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Liz Hall | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tana Jackson | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Brown | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Groves Williams | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sam Walker | Trustee | 14 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.