Trustees TOBIAS TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 1098710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Georgina Elwes Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
Robert James Dobson Trustee 21 May 2024
None on record
Rosemary Charles Trustee 18 February 2022
None on record
Jane Theresa Quail Trustee 15 May 2018
None on record
Christopher Melvyn Clouder Trustee 06 March 2014
None on record
CATRIONA MITCHELL ALDERTON Trustee 30 January 2012
None on record