THE MOTHERS COMMITTEE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PURSUE THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY WITH ALL THE RESOURCES AVAILABLE TO THE CHARITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Manchester City
Governance
- 05 February 2004: Standard registration
- 29 August 2014: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 29 August 2014: Funds transferred to 1153594 THE MOTHERS COMMITTEE
- THE MOTHERS COMMITTEE OF TASHBAR (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2009 | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | 19 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | 01 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE TASHBAR SCHOOL, SALFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window