Financial history THE UNIVERSITY OF NOTRE DAME (USA) IN ENGLAND

Charity number: 1098673
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.65m £3.62m £5.59m £8.08m £9.60m
Total expenditure £5.95m £4.59m £6.82m £8.84m £9.02m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.58m £980.98k £795.11k £1.47m £2.20m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.00m £2.63m £4.74m £5.39m £5.65m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £74.97k £7.35k £56.01k £1.21m £1.75m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.95m £4.59m £6.82m £8.84m £9.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £56.04k £87.12k £65.45k £148.37k £279.93k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0