Accounts and annual returns ESSENCE COUNSELLING AND TRAINING ENTERPRISE

Charity number: 1101186
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2013 28 February 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2013 13 March 2014 13 days late