Financial history ESSENCE COUNSELLING AND TRAINING ENTERPRISE

Charity number: 1101186
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2009 30/04/2010 30/04/2011 30/04/2012 30/04/2013
Total gross income £51.26k £21.55k £59.74k £58.01k £51.19k
Total expenditure £49.34k £22.71k £56.34k £44.98k £58.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A