INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR RESTORATIVE PRACTICES (IIRP) EUROPE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IIRP EUROPE achieves its promotion of restorative practices by the sale of books, videos and DVDs, and the provision of training, consultancy and services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2020
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- Denmark
- Hungary
- Ireland
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Spain
Governance
- 22 October 2004: Standard registration
- 29 December 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR RESTORATIVE PRACTICES (Previous name)
- INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR RESTORATIVE PRACTICES (IIRP) UK AND IRELAND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.23k | £67.92k | £133.09k | £66.15k | £71.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.76k | £90.03k | £92.66k | £114.51k | £106.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 30 September 2020 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 30 September 2020 | 153 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 15 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 15 January 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/07/2000 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/07/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE RESTORATIVE PRACTICES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS A MEANS OF RESOLVING CONFLICT AND PROMOTING RECONCILIATION BY 1. PROMOTING THE USE OF RESTORATIVE JUSTICE AND RESTORATIVE PRACTICES IN SCHOOLS, IN THE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SYSTEM, IN THE WORKPLACE AND ELSEWHERE IN THE COMMUNITY IN SITUATIONS WHERE CONFLICT MAY ARISE; 2. DEVELOPING AND PROMOTING AGREED STANDARDS AND PRINCIPLES FOR EVALUATING AND GUIDING RESTORATIVE PRACTICES; AND 3. ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RESEARCH ON RESTORATIVE PRACTICES AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONCEPT OF RESTORATIVE PRACTICES INCLUDING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A SCHOOL USING RESTORATIVE PRACTICES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window