HIZEN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1100348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Kendo (Japanese Martial Arts Class)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £14,749
Total expenditure: £24,136

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Camden

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 October 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR J T HUMM Chair
None on record
Junlin Zhang Trustee 04 July 2023
None on record
Tadeos Micheal Shahbazian Trustee 04 July 2023
None on record
Huey Lu Lok Trustee 01 May 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.33k £13.19k £35.49k £17.33k £14.75k
Total expenditure £20.23k £7.94k £19.29k £21.12k £24.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
113 GRANGEHILL ROAD
LONDON
SE9 1SF
Phone:
07447659490