Accounts and annual returns NORTH CUMBRIA NHS CHARITABLE FUNDS

Charity number: 1097932
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 20 January 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 05 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 05 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 11 February 2009 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 22 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 28 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 30 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 30 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 30 January 2007 On Time