Financial history PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS OF DODLESTON SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1100062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.51k £71 £7.46k £5.89k £6.11k
Total expenditure £2.59k £585 £3.63k £5.14k £6.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A