CPA TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are for the benefit of the public at large. To operate, organise and promote education and/or quality into all areas of quality and efficiency in medical laboratories. In addition to provide funding for pilot external quality assessment schemes which are designed to assure quality in medical laboratories.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 November 2003: Standard registration
- 16 December 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.00k | £282.83k | £4.85k | £10.02k | £6.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.08k | £61.52k | £29.08k | £39.70k | £43.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 08 December 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 13 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 11 August 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 19 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 09 September 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 31 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 16 November 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 28 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 28 December 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 MARCH 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE TO OPERATE, ORGANISE AND PROMOTE EDUCATION AND/OR TRAINING INTO ALL AREAS OF QUALITY AND EFFICIENCY IN MEDICAL LABORATORIES, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO PATHOLOGY LABORATORIES AND TO PROVIDE FUNDING FOR PILOT EXTERNAL QUALITY ASSESSMENT SCHEMES WHICH ARE DESIGNED TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP EFFICIENCY, QUALITY AND STANDARDS IN MEDICAL LABORATORIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window