Financial history HARTLEPOOL VOLUNTARY DEVELOPMENT AGENCY LIMITED

Charity number: 1098248
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 30/09/2017
Total gross income £482.84k £645.33k £465.81k £500.88k £66.33k
Total expenditure £506.43k £610.17k £570.25k £236.80k £541.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £299.06k £451.56k £888
Income from government grants N/A N/A £100.10k £0 £0
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £47.09k N/A £31.95k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £591.52k N/A £467.03k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £6.71k N/A £1.90k N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £596.39k N/A £236.80k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £7.22k N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A