Financial history LIGHT FOR THE LAST DAYS

Charity number: 1099651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £114.95k £93.18k £99.50k £97.61k £109.43k
Total expenditure £76.92k £90.87k £114.01k £112.56k £129.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A