Financial history THE FAITH HEALTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1100752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.64k £9.40k £7.02k £8.63k £9.46k
Total expenditure £8.58k £9.24k £7.01k £8.57k £9.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A