THE FAITH HEALTH PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Health Awareness Campaigns, Social issues Awareness Events, Information and and Advice on Health issues and health Services, Referral to the appropriate services, Emotional, Spiritual and Practical support to individuals and families, Advocacy, Training, Bible Teaching.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barking And Dagenham
- Havering
- Newham
- Redbridge
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 17 November 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev KAMBALE SALOMOM TSHILONGO | Chair | 07 April 2011 |
|
|||||
MARTINE TANSELE | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dominique Nitu Lufuanadio | Trustee | 06 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Papy Ataty Tanda | Trustee | 06 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.64k | £9.40k | £7.02k | £8.63k | £9.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.58k | £9.24k | £7.01k | £8.57k | £9.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 MARCH 2003 AS AMENDED 17 OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY , SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE. GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
123 BADDOW CLOSE
WOODFORD GREEN
IG8 7JF
- Phone:
- 07747727891
- Email:
- faithhproject@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window