XTREME DISABLED MOTORSPORTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dormant
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 August 2003: Standard registration
- 04 March 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.75k | £20.06k | £9.97k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.60k | £31.55k | £19.96k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 02 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 30 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 30 January 2007 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 MARCH 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6 JULY 2003.
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM PARAPLEGIA, TETRAPLEGIA, AND OTHER DISEASES CAUSING UPPER AND LOWER LIMB DISABILITY. 2) THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR SUCH PATIENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window