TRAFFORD COMMUNITY LEISURE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide leisure, recreation and educational opportunities for the community and surrounding areas of Trafford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2021
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Trafford
Governance
- 25 August 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANCIS ARTHUR PETER MARTIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT DAVID MOORE | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
GARY HEBBLEWHITE | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROWENA LEMAY BIRCH | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAMES CUMBES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN OLIPHANT GOULTY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TARUN KAPUR | Trustee |
|
||||||
BARRY STEPHEN PULLEN MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 30/11/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.25k | £8.11k | £10.70k | £1.14k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.80k | £2.79k | £3.02k | £1.26m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 220 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 220 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 586 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 586 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 March 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/02/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/05/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/09/2015
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY HAS BEEN ESTABLISHED FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT PRIMARILY FOR THE COMMUNITY AND VISITORS TO THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF TRAFFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES (THE "OBJECTS") (A) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE SUCH FACILITIES BEING PROVIDED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE SAVE THAT SPECIAL FACILITIES MAY BE PROVIDED TO THE PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES MAY HAVE NEED OF SPECIAL FACILITIES AND SERVICES; AND/OR (B) TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH THROUGH COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION; AND/OR (C) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY CONSISTENT WITH THE OBJECTS ABOVE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF TRAFFORD AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Western Road
Urmston
Manchester
M41 6LF
- Phone:
- 07740863905
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window