Financial history COMMUNITY RECYCLING NETWORK

Charity number: 1102277
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £554.71k £476.34k £215.93k £204.64k £41.63k
Total expenditure £693.10k £495.36k £248.38k £214.19k £89.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £508.24k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £2.89k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £43.58k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £676.52k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £16.58k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A