Financial history UMMAH HELPING HANDS

Charity number: 1100009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £53.99k £106.84k £85.26k £94.50k £111.68k
Total expenditure £53.59k £96.61k £100.04k £90.16k £121.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A