GOBLIN COMBE ENVIRONMENT CENTRE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Goblin Combe Environment Centre is committed to promotion of lifelong learning & enhanced personal self-esteem using the natural environment as a stimulus for education & improved self & social awareness. Our variety of residential & non-residential outdoor recreational & educational activities are open to all, but emphasis is put on meeting the needs of excluded & disadvantaged groups of any age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 19 September 2003: Standard registration
- 03 July 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 03 July 2015: Funds transferred to 293705 THE GROUNDWORK SOUTH TRUST LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £344.53k | £177.90k | £156.44k | £132.60k | £138.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £386.21k | £188.42k | £247.40k | £194.24k | £130.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 24 February 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 24 February 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 14 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 17 April 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 17 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 17 May 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 13 MAY 2003, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 11 DECEMBER 2003, AND 01/12/2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE CONNECTED WITH EDUCATION AND PROMOTION OF LIFELONG LEARNING, ENHANCEMENT, IMPROVEMENT, MAINTENANCE AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND LANDSCAPE AND IN PARTICULAR TO: (A) PROMOTE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AND DISADVANTAGED GROUPS TO GAIN ACCESS TO THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES; (B) PROMOTE AND PROVIDE AND FACILITATE OPPORTUNITIES FOR RESIDENTIAL STUDY AND EXPERIENCE IN THE COUNTRYSIDE; (C) PROMOTE AND PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR LIFELONG LEARNING WITHIN THE COMMUNITY; (D) PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE DEMONSTRATION OF RESOURCE EFFICIENT TECHNOLOGY; (E) EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS, AND PROVIDE BETTER APPRECIATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND BETTER WAYS OF SERVING, PROTECTING AND IMPROVING THE SAME AND EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE ENVIRONMENT AND ITS INTERACTION WITH THE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC WELLBEING OF THE COMMUNITY; (F) PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE USE AND ENJOYMENT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; (G) PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF OTHER GROUPS AND COLLABORATIVE WORKING BETWEEN ORGANISATIONS OBJECTS COMPLIMENTARY TO THOSE OF THE COMPANY; (H) PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, ENHANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE IMPORTANCE OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN RELATION TO ALL OF THE ACTIVITIES OF THE COMPANY. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE THE PHRASE "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" SHALL MEAN DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS AND IN APPLYING THIS DEFINITION REGARD SHALL BE HAD TO THE FOLLOWING FACTORS NAMELY, TO SOCIAL PROGRESS WHICH RECOGNISES THE NEEDS OF EVERYONE; EFFECTIVE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES AND MAINTENANCE OF HIGH AND STABLE LEVELS OF ECONOMIC GROWTH AND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window